Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16A45
No. 16A45
Title:
TC Heartland LLC, Applicant
v.
Kraft Food Brands Group LLC
Docketed:July 12, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2016-105)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 8 2016 Application (16A45) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2016 to September 12, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 13 2016 Application (16A45) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 12, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
James W. Dabney Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP(212) 837-6803
    Counsel of RecordOne Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY  10004-1482
Party name: TC Heartland LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543