Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-946
No. 16-946
Title:
John S. Verble, Petitioner
v.
Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-6397)
  Decision Date:January 13, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 26 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2017)
Feb 16 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Feb 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Richard Forlani Neely 159 Summers Street
    Counsel of RecordCharleston, WV  25301
Party name: John S. Verble
Attorneys for Respondents:
Andrew J. Schaffran Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP(212) 309-6380
    Counsel of Record101 Park Avenue
New York, NY  10178
Party name: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543