Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-920
No. 16-920
Vide 16-163
Title:
National Restaurant Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Labor, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2017
Linked with 16A529
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-35765)
  Decision Date:February 23, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 23 2016 Application (16A529) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2016 to January 19, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Nov 28 2016 Application (16A529) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 19, 2017.
Jan 19 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2017)
Feb 15 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Feb 23 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Mar 20 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 11, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Paul DeCamp Jackson Lewis, P.C.(703) 483-8305
    Counsel of Record10701 Parkridge Blvd., Suite 300
Reston, VA  20191
decampp@jacksonlewis.com
Party name: National Restaurant Association
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of Labor, et al.
Other:
M. Reed Hopper Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
mrh@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute
April 30, 2017 | Version 2014.2