Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-917
No. 16-917
Title:
Koichi Mera, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Glendale, California
Docketed:January 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-56440)
  Decision Date:August 4, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:October 13, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 9 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2017)
Feb 22 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Government of Japan filed.
Feb 22 2017 Brief of respondent City of Glendale, California in opposition filed.
Feb 22 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Dissemination of Historical Fact & Nippon Today's Researchers Society (Kingen) filed.
Mar 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 13 2017 Reply of petitioners Koichi Mera, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 27 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
William Benjamin DeClercq 225 South Lake Avenue 626-408-2150
    Counsel of RecordSuite 300
Pasadena, CA  91101
William@DeClercqLaw.com
Party name: Koichi Mera, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Mark E. Haddad Sidley Austin LLP(213) 896-6000
    Counsel of Record555 W. Fifth Street, 40th Floor
Los Angeles, CA  90013
mhaddad@sidley.com
Party name: City of Glendale, California
Other:
Jessica L. Ellsworth Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5886
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
Party name: The Government of Japan
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2