Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-907
No. 16-907
Title:
In Re Diane Blumstein, et al., Petitioners
v.
Docketed:January 19, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 18 2017 Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due February 21, 2017)
Feb 17 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Federal Respondents, et al. to respond filed.
Feb 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Diane Blumstein 276 Chestnut Hill Ave., Apt 11(587) 928-2094
Brighton, MA  02135
Party name:
 
Nancy Goodman P.O. Box 836(978) 309-5553
Rockport, MA  01966
 
Donna Soodalter-Toman 30 Starknaught Heights(617) 447-7527
Gloucester, MA  01930
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Federal Respondents, et al.
March 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2