Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-894
No. 16-894
Title:
Edward Peruta, et al., Petitioners
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:January 17, 2017
Linked with 16A440
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(10-56971)
  Decision Date:June 9, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:August 15, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 31 2016 Application (16A440) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2016 to December 14, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Dec 2 2016 Application (16A440) to extend further the time from December 14, 2016 to January 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Dec 5 2016 Application (16A440) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 12, 2017.
Jan 12 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2017)
Jan 26 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel petitioners.
Jan 27 2017 Letter received from counsel for respondent.
Feb 2 2017 Waiver of right of respondents County of San Diego and Sheriff William D. Gore to respond filed.
Feb 6 2017 Consent the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., et al..
Feb 15 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amicus curiae of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of Western States Sheriffs' Association, et al. filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief of respondents County of Yolo and Sheriff Ed Prieto in opposition filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of Alabama and 25 other States filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of The Governors of Texas, et al. filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Mar 7 2017 Reply of petitioners Edward Peruta, et al. filed.
Mar 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 23 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 30 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 12 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 20 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: Edward Peruta, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
James M. Chapin Office of County Counsel(619) 531-4860
    Counsel of Record1600 Pacific Highway, Room 355
San Diego, CA  92101
james.chapin@sdcounty.ca.gov
Party name: County of San Diego and Sheriff William D. Gore
 
Michael J. Mongan Office of the Attorney General(415) 703-2548
    Counsel of Record455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA  94102
michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California
 
John A. Whitesides Angelo, Kilday & Kilduff916 564 6100
    Counsel of Record601 University Ave., Suite 150
Sacramento, CA  95825
jwhitesides@akk-law.com
Party name: County of Yolo and Sheriff Ed Prieto
 
Alan Gura Gura PLLC(703) 835-9085
916 Prince Street, Suite 107
Alexandria, VA  22314
www.gurapllc.cpm
Party name: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Other:
Andrew L. Brasher Solicitor General(334) 353-2609
Office of Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
abrasher@ago.state.al.us
Party name: Alabama and 25 other States
 
Anthony T. Caso Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2666
c/o Dale E. Fowler School of Law at Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92886
caso@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Charles J. Cooper Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Party name: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
 
Arthur C. D'Andrea Assistant Solicitor General(512) 936-0181
Texas Attorney General's Office
P. O. Box 12548 MC059
1100 San Jacinto Blvd.
Austin, TX  78711
arthur.dandrea@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: The Governors of Texas, et al.
 
David D. Jensen David D. Jensen PLLC(212)-380-6615
111 John Street, Suite 420
New York, NY  10038
david@djensenpllc.com
Party name: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
 
Robert Jeffrey Olson William J. Olson PC703-356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
 
Dan Mark Peterson Dan M Peterson PLLC(703) 352-7276
3925 Chain Bridge Road, Ste. 403
Fairfax, VA  220030
dan@danpetersonlaw.com
Party name: Western States Sheriffs' Association, et al.
June 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2