Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-890
No. 16-890
Title:
TDE Petroleum Data Solutions, Inc., Petitioner
v.
AKM Enterprise, Inc., dba Moblize, Inc.
Docketed:January 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2016-1004)
  Decision Date:August 15, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 13 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2017)
Jan 25 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Jan 31 2017 Waiver of right of respondent AKM Enterprise, Inc., dba Moblize, Inc. to respond filed.
Feb 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 16 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Infosource Communications, LLC and Reginal D. Harris, Pharm.D. R.PH. C.PH. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 16 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Craig W. Barber filed. (Distributed)
Feb 16 2017 Brief amici curiae of 15 Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Feb 16 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Richard A. Fagin, Registered Patent Attorney No. 39,182 filed. (Distributed)
Mar 6 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Malcolm Edwin Whittaker 2341 Glen Haven Boulevard 832-434-7157
    Counsel of RecordHouston, TX  77030
IPLitigate@aol.com
Party name: TDE Petroleum Data Solutions, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Peter E. Mims Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.(713) 758-2732
    Counsel of Record1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2500
Houston, TX  77002
pmims@velaw.com
Party name: AKM Enterprise, Inc., dba Moblize, Inc.
Other:
Stephen Luke Anderson Atlanta Technology Law(404) 991-2241
1230 Peachtree Street, NE Suite 1900
Atlanta, GA  30309
Landerson@atltechlaw.com
Party name: Craig W. Barber
 
Alphonse Bernard Perkins 7270 Placid Oaks Drive(904) 472-6030
Jacksonville, FL  32277
abperkins@gmail.com
Party name: Infosource Communications, LLC and Reginal D. Harris, Pharm.D. R.PH. C.PH.
June 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2