~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 5 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 9, 2017) |
Jan 27 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondent Andrew Dickson to respond filed. |
Feb 8 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 9 2017 |
Brief amici curiae of Michigan and Eleven Others States filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 16 2017 |
Response Requested . (Due March 20, 2017) |
Mar 20 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 12, 2017. |
May 12 2017 |
Brief of respondent Andrew Dickson in opposition filed. |
May 12 2017 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andrew Dickson. |
May 25 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Connecticut filed. |
May 30 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |