Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-814
No. 16-814
Title:
Monifa J. Sterling, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 28, 2016
Linked with 16A353
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(15-0510, 16-0223)
  Decision Date:August 10, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 11 2016 Application (16A353) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 8, 2016 to December 23, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 12 2016 Application (16A353) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 23, 2016.
Dec 23 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2017)
Jan 4 2017 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jan 11 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Response Requested . (Due February 13, 2017)
Jan 13 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jan 27 2017 Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Jan 27 2017 Brief amicus curiae of LTC Kamal S. Kalsi, D.O., U.S.A.R. filed.
Jan 27 2017 Brief amici curiae of Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Feb 8 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 15, 2017.
Feb 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Dr. S. Simcha Goldman filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Retired Generals filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amici curiae of 36 Members of Congress filed.
Feb 14 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Military Religious Freedom Foundation filed.
Mar 14 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 12, 2017.
Apr 12 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 1 2017 Reply of petitioner Monifa J. Sterling filed.
May 2 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 16 2017 Rescheduled.
May 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 23 2017 Rescheduled.
May 30 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: Monifa J. Sterling
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Brian D. Boyle O'Melveny & Myers, LLP(202) 383-5300
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
bboyle@omm.com
Party name: LTC Kamal S. Kalsi, D.O., U.S.A.R.
 
Kimberlee Wood Colby Christian Legal Society(703) 894-1087
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA  22151
kcolby@clsnet.org
Party name: Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al.
 
John A. Eidsmoe Foundation for Moral Law(334) 262-1245
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36104
eidsmoeja@juno.com
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
 
Kyle Douglas Hawkins Gibson, Dunn, & Crutcher, LLP(214) 698-3100
2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100
Dallas, TX  75201
khawkins@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Monifa J. Sterling v. United States
 
Sean D. Jordan Jackson Walker, LLP(512) 236-2281
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX  78701
sjordan@jw.com
Party name: 36 Members of Congress
 
Scott A. Keller Solicitor General(512) 936-1700
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2548
scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
Party name: Texas, et al.
 
Donald G. Rehkopf Jr. Brenna Boyce, PLLC(585) 454-2000
31 East Main Street
Suite 2000
Rochester, NY  14614
drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com
Party name: The Military Religious Freedom Foundation
 
Aaron M. Streett Baker Botts, L.L.P.(713) 229-1855
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX  77002
aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
Party name: Retired Generals
June 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2