Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-7904
No. 16-7904
Title:
Gary L. Ozenne, Petitioner
v.
Chase Manhattan Bank, et al.
Docketed:February 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-60039)
  Decision Date:November 9, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 7 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2017)
Mar 29 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Gary Ozenne 7351 Piute Creek Drive(951) 797-8465
Corona, CA  92881
Party name: Gary L. Ozenne

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543