Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-784
No. 16-784
Title:
Merit Management Group, LP, Petitioner
v.
FTI Consulting, Inc.
Docketed:December 20, 2016
Linked with 16A492
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3388)
  Decision Date:July 28, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 14 2016 Application (16A492) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2016 to December 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 17 2016 Application (16A492) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 19, 2016.
Dec 16 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2017)
Jan 19 2017 Brief of respondent FTI Consulting, Inc. in opposition filed.
Feb 3 2017 Reply of petitioner Merit Management Group, LP filed.
Feb 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 22 2017 Rescheduled.
Feb 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 13 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 13 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 20 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 28 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 1 2017 Petition GRANTED.
Jun 5 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 13, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2017.
Jun 22 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for the petitioner.
Jun 28 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
Jul 13 2017 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 13 2017 Brief of petitioner Merit Management Group, LP filed.
Jul 18 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Opportunity Partners, L.P. filed.
Jul 20 2017 Brief amici curiae of Various Former Tribune and Lyondell Shareholders filed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Brian C. Walsh Bryan Cave, LLP(314) 259-2000
    Counsel of Record211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO  63102
brian.walsh@bryancave.com
Party name: Merit Management Group, LP
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: FTI Consulting, Inc.
 
Barbara Whiten Balliette Reid Collins & Tsai LLP(512) 647-6100
1301 S. Capital of Texas Hwy.
Building C, Suite 300
Austin, TX  78746
bballeiette@rctlegal.com
Party name: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Other:
Philip D. Anker Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP(212) 230-8890
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY  10007
philip.anker@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Various Former Tribune and Lyondell Shareholders
 
Alan E. Golomb 492 Bardini Drive (516) 509-0509
Melville, NY  11747
aandp492@aol.com
Party name: Opportunity Partners, L.P.
July 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2