Docket for 16-76
No. 16-76 | |
Title: |
J. Carl Cooper, Petitioner |
v. |
Square, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | July 15, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1925, 2015-1942, 2015-1943) |
Decision Date: | April 14, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 13 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 15, 2016) |
Aug 12 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Square, Inc. to respond filed. |
Aug 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Sep 9 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due October 11, 2016) |
Sep 30 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Raymond A. Mercado, PH.D. filed. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Brief of respondent Square, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Oct 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner J. Carl Cooper filed. |
Oct 25 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016. |
Nov 14 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|