Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-755
No. 16-755
Title:
Robert Menendez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 14, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3459)
  Decision Date:July 29, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:September 13, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 12 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2017)
Jan 11 2017 Brief amici curiae of Former General Counsels of The U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Jan 12 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 13, 2017.
Feb 13 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Feb 27 2017 Reply of petitioner Robert Menendez filed.
Mar 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Abbe David Lowell Chadbourne & Parke LLP(202) 974-5600
    Counsel of Record1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ADLowell@chadbourne.com
Party name: Robert Menendez
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
William Pittard KaiserDillon, PLLC(202) 640-2850
1401 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
wpittard@kaiserdillon.com
Party name: Former General Counsels of The U.S. House of Representatives
March 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2