Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-7393
No. 16-7393     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Michael Dewayne Smith, Petitioner
v.
Terry Royal, Warden
Docketed:January 3, 2017
Linked with 16A382
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-6201)
  Decision Date:June 6, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:August 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 14 2016 Application (16A382) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2016 to December 29, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Oct 19 2016 Application (16A382) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 29, 2016.
Dec 29 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 2, 2017)
Jan 31 2017 Brief of respondent Terry Royal, Warden in opposition filed.
Feb 10 2017 Reply of petitioner Michael Dewayne Smith filed.
Feb 16 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 13 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.
Apr 11 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 19 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 Rehearing DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Emma V. Rolls Assistant Federal Public Defender(405) 609-5975
    Counsel of Record Office of the Federal Public Defender
Western District of Oklahoma
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK  73102
Emma_Rolls@fd.org
Party name: Michael Dewayne Smith
Attorneys for Respondent:
Thomas Lee Tucker Office of the Attorney General(405) 521-3921
    Counsel of Record313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK  73105
thomas.tucker@oag.ok.gov
Party name: Terry Royal, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543