Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-7165
No. 16-7165
Title:
Marc A. Stephens, Petitioner
v.
Edward A. Jerejian, Judge, Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, et al.
Docketed:December 13, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3992)
  Decision Date:June 16, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 11 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 12, 2017)
Jan 10 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Judge Honorable Edward A. Jerejian and John Jay Hoffman to respond filed.
Jan 26 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Petition DENIED.
Mar 13 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Rehearing DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Marc Stephens 271 Rosemont Place
Englewood, NJ  07631
Party name: Marc A. Stephens
Attorneys for Respondents:
Adam Robert Gibbons Office of the Attorney's General of New Jersey(609) 633-8687
    Counsel of Record 25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ  08625
adam.gibbons@lps.state,nj.us
Party name: Judge Honorable Edward A. Jerejian and John Jay Hoffman
June 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2