Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-712
No. 16-712
Title:
Oil States Energy Services, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Greene's Energy Group, LLC, et al.
Docketed:November 29, 2016
Linked with 16A365
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2015-1855)
  Decision Date:May 4, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 26, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 13 2016 Application (16A365) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2016 to November 23, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 14 2016 Application (16A365) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 23, 2016.
Nov 23 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2016)
Dec 12 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Director, Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed.
Dec 19 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 30, 2017.
Jan 30 2017 Brief of respondent Greene's Energy Group, LLC in opposition filed.
Feb 14 2017 Reply of petitioner Oil States Energy Services, LLC filed.
Feb 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Response Requested from Michelle K. Lee, Director, Patent and Trademark Office. (Due March 29, 2017)
Mar 22 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 28, 2017.
Apr 28 2017 Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
May 15 2017 Reply of petitioner Oil States Energy Services, LLC filed.
May 16 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017 Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 7 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jul 13 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2017.
Jul 13 2017 The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017.
Jul 13 2017 The reply brief on the merits is to be filed on or before November 20, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Allyson N. Ho Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP(214) 466-4000
    Counsel of Record1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX  75201-7347
allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
Party name: Oil States Energy Services, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents:
George E. Quillin Foley & Lardner LLP(202) 672-5300
    Counsel of Record3000 K St., NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC  20007
gquillin@foley.com
Party name: Greene's Energy Group, LLC
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Joseph Matal, Interim Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
July 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2