Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-697
No. 16-697
Vide 16-687, 16-688, 16-698, 16-699, 16-736
Title:
Gillette Commercial Operations North America and Subsidiaries, Petitioner
v.
Michigan Department of Treasury
Docketed:November 25, 2016
Linked with 16A263
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
  Case Nos.:(325258)
  Decision Date:September 29, 2015
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:June 24, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 12 2016 Application (16A263) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 22, 2016 to November 21, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 13 2016 Application (16A263) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 21, 2016.
Nov 21 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2016)
Dec 20 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. VIDED
Dec 21 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Michigan Department of Treasury to respond filed.
Dec 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Tax Executives Institute, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Dec 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The American College of Tax Counsel filed. VIDED.
Dec 23 2016 Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Dec 23 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Council on State Taxation filed. VIDED.
Jan 3 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 10 2017 Response Requested . (Due February 9, 2017)
Feb 1 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 13, 2017.
Mar 13 2017 Brief of respondent Michigan Department of Treasury in opposition filed. VIDED.
Mar 28 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Mar 28 2017 Reply of petitioners Gillette Commercial Operations North America and Subsidiaries filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Charles A. Rothfeld Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Gillette Commercial Operations North America and Subsidiaries
Attorneys for Respondent:
Aaron D. Lindstrom Solicitor General(517) 373-1124
    Counsel of Record Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
LindstromA@michigan.gov
Party name: Michigan Department of Treasury
Other:
Karl A. Frieden Council on State Taxation(202) 484-5222
122 C Street NW, Suite 330
Washington, DC  20001
kfrieden@cost.org
Party name: Council on State Taxation
 
Frederick Liu Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC  20004
frederick.liu@hoganlovells.com
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
 
A. Pilar Mata Tax Executives Institute, Inc.202-464-8346
1200 G Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC  20005-3814
pmata@tei.org
Party name: Tax Executives Institute, Inc.
 
Stewart M. Weintraub Chanberlain Hrdlicka(610) 772-2322
300 Conshohocken State Rd., Suite 570
West Conshohocken, PA  19428
Stewart.Weintraub@chamberlainlaw.com
Party name: The American College of Tax Counsel
May 29, 2017 | Version 2014.2