Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 16-6855
No. 16-6855     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Marion Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:November 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-10681)
  Decision Date:August 23, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 10 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 15, 2016)
Dec 19 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 5, 2017.
Jan 5 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Adam K. Mortara, in support of respondent filed.
Jan 5 2017 Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden filed.
Jan 19 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Adam K. Mortara, Esquire, of Chicago, Illinois, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Mar 15 2017 Letter from respondent regarding position in case. (Distributed)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Brian Kammer Georgia Resource Center(404) 222-9202
    Counsel of Record303 Elizabeth Street, NE
Atlanta, GA  30307
brian.kammer@garesource.org
Party name: Marion Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent:
Sabrina D. Graham Senior Assistant Attorney General(404) 656-7659
    Counsel of Record State Law Department
40 Capitol Square, S.W.
Atlanta, GA  30334-1300
sgraham@law.ga.gov
Party name: Eric Sellers, Warden
 
Adam K. Mortara Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP(312) 494-4400
    Counsel of Record54 W. Hubbard St., Suite 300
Chicago, IL  60654
adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
March 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2