Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-6814
No. 16-6814
Title:
Keith Alexander Ashe, Petitioner
v.
PNC Financial Services Group, Incorporated
Docketed:November 10, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2566)
  Decision Date:June 13, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 9 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 12, 2016)
Dec 12 2016 Brief of respondent PNC Financial Services Group, Incorporated in opposition filed.
Dec 22 2016 Reply of petitioner Keith Alexander Ashe filed.
Dec 29 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017 The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until February 7, 2017, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Feb 7 2017 Petitioner complied with order of January 17, 2017.
Feb 16 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 6 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Keith Alexander Ashe 4835 Cordell Avenue(240) 479-4705
Bethesda, MD  20814
kashe@spendology.net
Party name: Keith Alexander Ashe
Attorneys for Respondent:
Mark Stuart Sommers Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett 7 Dunner, LLP(202) 408-4000
    Counsel of Record901 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20001
mark.sommers@finnegan.com
Party name: PNC Financial Services Group, Incorporated

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543