Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-6761
No. 16-6761
Title:
Frank Caira, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 7, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1003)
  Decision Date:August 17, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 11 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 7, 2016)
Nov 23 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Dec 1 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Dec 7 2016 Response Requested . (Due January 6, 2017)
Dec 28 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 6, 2017.
Feb 6 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Feb 17 2017 Reply of petitioner Frank Caira filed.
Feb 23 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 1 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Hannah Valdez Garst 121 S. Wilke Rd.(773) 248-6504
    Counsel of RecordSuite 301
Arlington Heights, IL  60005
hannahgarst@garstlaw.com
Party name: Frank Caira
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
April 20, 2017 | Version 2014.2