Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-6694
No. 16-6694
Vide 16-6308
Title:
Eric Jordan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 2, 2016
Linked with 16A115
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-4825)
  Decision Date:May 31, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 28 2016 Application (16A115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2016 to October 28, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 3 2016 Application (16A115) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 28, 2016.
Oct 27 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 2, 2016)
Nov 23 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2017.
Dec 15 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2017.
Feb 2 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 6, 2017.
Mar 6 2017 Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent.
Mar 15 2017 Reply of petitioner Eric Jordan filed.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Ruth J. Geller Vernet 31 Wood Lane(301) 251-9500
    Counsel of RecordRockville, MD  20852
ruthvernet@aol.com
Party name: Eric Jordan
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
April 18, 2017 | Version 2014.2