Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 16-658
No. 16-658
Title:
Charmaine Hamer, Petitioner
v.
Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago, et al.
Docketed:November 17, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3764)
  Decision Date:August 31, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 15 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2016)
Dec 14 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 18, 2017, for all respondents.
Jan 18 2017 Brief of respondents Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago & Fannie Mae in opposition filed.
Jan 30 2017 Reply of petitioner Charmaine Hamer filed.
Feb 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Petition GRANTED.
Mar 2 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Mar 8 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 15, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jonathan A. Herstoff Haug Partners LLP212-588-0800
    Counsel of Record745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY  10151
jherstoff@haugpartners.com
Party name: Charmaine Hamer
Attorneys for Respondents:
Linda T. Coberly Winston & Strawn LLP(312) 558-8768
    Counsel of Record35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL  60601
lcoberly@winston.com
Party name: Neighborhood Housing Services of Chicago & Fannie Mae
March 21, 2017 | Version 2014.2