Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-6496
No. 16-6496     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Stacey Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2016
Linked with 16A336
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arkansas
  Case Nos.:(CV-15-992)
  Decision Date:June 23, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 21, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 5 2016 Application (16A336) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 19, 2016 to November 18, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito.
Oct 6 2016 Response in opposition to application from respondents Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, et al. filed.
Oct 7 2016 Application (16A336) denied by Justice Alito.
Oct 19 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 21, 2016)
Nov 4 2016 Brief of respondents Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 15 2016 Reply of petitioners Stacey Johnson, et al. filed.
Nov 21 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Louis Stein Center for Law and Ethics at Fordham University School of Law filed. (Distributed)
Nov 22 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Dec 22 2016 Supplemental brief of petitioners Stacey Johnson, et al. filed.
Dec 27 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Feb 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 14 2017 Second supplemental brief of petitioners Stacey Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 14 2017 Amendment to the Second supplemental brief of petitioners Stacey Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 21 2017 Petition DENIED Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Breyer joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent from the denial of certiorari for the reasons set out in Arthur v. Dunn, 580 U.S. ___ (2017) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting from denial of certiorari).
Mar 20 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 10 2017 Supplemental brief to the petition for rehearing filed. (Distributed)
Apr 12 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Application (16A986) for a stay of execution of sentences of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Apr 17 2017 Response to application from respondent Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, et al. filed.
Apr 18 2017 Reply of applicant Stacey Johnson, et al. filed.
Apr 20 2017 Application (16A986) referred to the Court.
Apr 20 2017 Application (16A986) denied by the Court. Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would grant the application for stay of execution. Justice Breyer dissenting from the denial of the application for stay: I dissent from the denial of certiorari for the reasons set out in McGehee v. Hutchinson, 580 U.S. __ (2017).
Apr 24 2017 Rehearing DENIED. Justice Sotomayor would grant the petition for rehearing.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Meredith L. Boylan Venable LLP(202) 344-4000
    Counsel of Record600 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
mlboylan@venable.com
Party name: Stacey Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Lee Rudofsky Solicitor General(501) 682-6302
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General
323 Center Street
Little Rock, AR  72201
lee.rudofsky@arkansasag.gov
Party name: Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, et al.
Other:
Ellyde Roko Thompson Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP212-849-7000
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10010
ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
Party name: The Louis Stein Center for Law and Ethics at Fordham University School of Law
July 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2