Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-649
No. 16-649
Title:
North Carolina, et al., Appellants
v.
Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Docketed:November 16, 2016
Linked with 16A1202
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
  Case Nos.:(1:15-cv-399)
  Decision Date:August 11, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 14 2016 Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 16, 2016)
Dec 16 2016 Motion to affirm filed by appellees Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Dec 30 2016 Response to motion to affirm from appellants North Carolina, et al., Appellants filed.
Jan 3 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
May 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 24 2017 Supplemental brief of appellants North Carolina, et al., Appellants filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
May 30 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
May 31 2017 Response to supplemental brief from appellees Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Jun 5 2017 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED.
Jun 6 2017 Application (16A1202) for issuance of the judgment forthwith, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 7 2017 Response to application (16A1202) requested by The Chief Justice, due Tuesday, June 13, 2017, by 3 p.m. ET.
Jun 13 2017 Response to application from Philip E. Berger, et al. filed.
Jun 13 2017 Response to application from North Carolina, et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017 Reply of Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed.
Jun 15 2017 Application (16A1202) referred to the Court.
Jun 15 2017 Application (16A1202) denied by the Court.
Jun 30 2017 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Appellants:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: North Carolina, et al., Appellants
Attorneys for Appellees:
Anita S. Earls Southern Coalition for Social Justice(919) 794-4198
    Counsel of Record1415 W. NC Highway 54, Suite 101
Durham, NC  27707
anita@scsj.org
Party name: Sandra Little Covington, et al.
July 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2