Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-6308
No. 16-6308
Vide 16-6694
Title:
Aaron Graham, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 4, 2016
Linked with 16A126
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-4659)
  Decision Date:May 31, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 2 2016 Application (16A126) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2016 to September 26, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 5 2016 Application (16A126) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 26, 2016.
Sep 26 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 3, 2016)
Oct 27 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 5, 2016.
Oct 28 2016 Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of U.S. Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Nov 21 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2017.
Dec 15 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2017.
Feb 3 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Feb 21 2017 Reply of petitioner Aaron Graham filed.
Feb 23 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Feb 23 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Meghan S. Skelton Assistant Federal Public Defender(301) 344-0600
6411 Ivy Lane, Suite 710
Greenbelt, MD  20770
Party name: Aaron Graham
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
James W. Harper Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachuetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
jharper@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute
 
Jennifer Lynch Electronic Frontier Foundation(415)-436-9333
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA  94109
jlynch@eff.org
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
 
Herbert W. Titus William J. Olson, PC(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180 - 5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: U.S. Justice Foundation, et al.
May 29, 2017 | Version 2014.2