Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-6250
No. 16-6250
Title:
Robert Perez, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:September 29, 2016
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District
  Case Nos.:(5D14-2391)
  Decision Date:March 15, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 26 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 31, 2016)
Nov 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016.
Nov 22 2016 Response Requested . (Due December 22, 2016)
Dec 20 2016 Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Jan 4 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 12 2017 Reply of petitioner Robert Perez filed. (Distributed)
Feb 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 6 2017 Petition DENIED Justice Sotomayor, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Mar 30 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 12 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 1 2017 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeremy C. Marwell 2200 Pennsylvania Ave., NW(202) 639-6507
Ste. 500 West
Washington, DC  20037-1701
jmarwell@velaw.com
Party name: Robert Perez
Attorneys for Respondent:
Pamela J. Koller Office of the Attorney General (386) 238-4990
    Counsel of Record 444 Seabreeze Blvd
Suite 500
Daytona Beach, FL  32118
pamela.koller@myfloridalegal.com
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543