Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-612
No. 16-612
Title:
Roy Langbord, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:November 4, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-4574)
  Decision Date:August 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 28 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2016)
Nov 30 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Department of the Treasury, et al. to respond filed.
Dec 14 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 6 2017 Response Requested . (Due February 6, 2017)
Feb 2 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 8, 2017.
Mar 8 2017 Brief of respondents Department of the Treasury, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 20 2017 Reply of petitioner Roy Langbord, et al. filed.
Mar 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Barry Berke 1177 Avenue of the Americas (212) 715-9100
    Counsel of RecordNew York, NY  10036
Bberke@kramerlevin.com
Party name: Roy Langbord, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of the Treasury, et al.
May 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2