Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-588
No. 16-588
Title:
Neil Parrott, et al., Appellants
v.
Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Docketed:November 1, 2016
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
  Case Nos.:(GLR-15-1849)
  Decision Date:August 24, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 28 2016 Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 1, 2016)
Dec 1 2016 Motion to affirm filed by appellees Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Dec 8 2016 Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by The Campaign Legal Center, et al.
Dec 20 2016 Opposition to motion to affirm of appellant Neil Parrott, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Campaign Legal Center, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 9 2017 Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Appellants:
Robert D. Popper Judicial Watch, Inc.(202) 646-5172
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC  20024
rpopper@judicialwatch.org
Party name: Neil Parrott, et al., Appellants
Attorneys for Appellees:
Julia Doyle Bernhardt Deputy Chief of Litigation(410) 576-7291
    Counsel of Record Civil Litigation Division
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore,, MD  21202
jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
Party name: Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Other:
Jessica Ring Amunson Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
jamunson@jenner.com
Party name: The Campaign Legal Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543