Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-5046
No. 16-5046
Title:
Glen Earl Cotonuts, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 29, 2016
Linked with 15A1059
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-1539)
  Decision Date:January 26, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 13 2016 Application (15A1059) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2016 to June 24, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Apr 15 2016 Application (15A1059) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 24, 2016.
Jun 24 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2016)
Jul 6 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 14 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 21 2016 Response Requested . (Due October 21, 2016)
Oct 12 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2016.
Nov 21 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Dec 8 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 5 2017 Reply of petitioner Glen Earl Cotonuts filed. (Distributed)
Jan 6 2017 Rescheduled.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 12 2017 Rescheduled.
Jan 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 18 2017 Rescheduled.
Feb 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Howard A. Pincus Assistant Federal Public Defender(303) 294-7002
    Counsel of Record 633 17th Street
Suite 1000
Denver, CO  80202
Howard_Pincus@fd.org
Party name: Glen Earl Cotonuts
Attorneys for Respondent:
Noel J. Francisco Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543