Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-497
No. 16-497
Title:
Martin Smith, Petitioner
v.
Internal Revenue Service
Docketed:October 13, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-15857)
  Decision Date:July 13, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 11 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2016)
Nov 10 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016.
Nov 14 2016 Brief amici curiae of The National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al. filed.
Dec 2 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Brief of respondent Internal Revenue Service in opposition filed.
Jan 31 2017 Reply of petitioner Martin Smith filed.
Feb 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John A. E. Pottow c/o 970A LR(734) 647-3736
    Counsel of Record801 Monroe Street
Ann Arbor, MI  48109
pottow@umich.edu
Party name: Martin Smith
Attorneys for Respondent:
Noel J. Francisco Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Internal Revenue Service
Other:
Tara Twomey National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center(831) 229-0256
1501 The Alameda, Suite 200
San Jose, CA  95126
ttwomey@me.com
Party name: The National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al.
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2