Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-466
No. 16-466
Title:
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Petitioner
v.
Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
  Case Nos.:(S221038)
  Decision Date:August 29, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 7 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 10, 2016)
Oct 13 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner and counsel for the respondents.
Nov 10 2016 Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 10 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Nov 10 2016 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
Nov 10 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Nov 10 2016 Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC filed.
Nov 15 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 9, 2016.
Dec 7 2016 Brief of respondents Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 20 2016 Reply of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed.
Dec 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 19 2017 Petition GRANTED.
Feb 13 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Feb 13 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondents.
Feb 17 2017 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 25, 2017
Feb 24 2017 Record requested from the Supreme Court of California.
Mar 1 2017 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Mar 1 2017 Brief of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed.
Mar 2 2017 Record received from the Supreme Court of California (1 box).
Mar 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of GlaxoSmithKline LLC filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Mar 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Texas Association of Broadcasters filed.
Mar 9 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
Mar 9 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed out of time by MoneyMutual LLP.
Mar 22 2017 CIRCULATED.
Mar 27 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al. GRANTED.
Mar 30 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison filed. (Distributed)
Mar 31 2017 Brief of respondents Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by MoneyMutual LLP GRANTED.
Apr 5 2017 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Apr 5 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Auto Safety filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Attorneys Information Exchange Group filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of California Constitution Center filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amici curiae of Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice, P.C. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization filed. (Distributed)
Apr 7 2017 Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure Professors filed. (Distributed)
Apr 11 2017 Response of respondents to motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Apr 12 2017 Reply of Acting Solicitor General to respondents' response to motion filed.
Apr 13 2017 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Apr 18 2017 Reply of petitioner Bristol-Myers Squibb Company filed. (Distributed)
Apr 25 2017 Argued. For petitioner: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.; and Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Bethesda, Md.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Attorneys for Respondents:
Thomas C. Goldstein Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
    Counsel of Record7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
tg@goldsteinrussell.com
Party name: Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Other:
Louis M. Bograd Motley Rice, LLC(202) 386-9623
401 9th Street,nw, Suite 10013869623
Washington, DC  20004
lbograd@motleyrice.com
Party name: Public Justice, P.C.
 
Pamela Karten Bookman Temple University(215) 204-8983
Beasley School of Law
1719North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA  19122
pamela.bookman@temple.edu
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors
 
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20006
jbucholtz@kslaw.com
Party name: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
 
Larry Coben Anapol Weiss480-515-4745
8700 E. Vista Bonita Drive Suite 268
Scottsdale, AZ  85255
lcben@anapolweiss.com
Party name: The Center for Auto Safety
 
Lawrence S. Ebner Capital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC(202) 729-6337
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20006
lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
David C. Frederick Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.(202) 326-7900
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036
dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
Party name: TV Azteca, S.A.B. de C.V., et al.
 
John Blaise Gsanger The Edwards Law Firm(361) 698-7600
Frost Bank Plaza, Ste. 1400 (78470)
P.O. Drawer 480
Corpus Christi, TX  78403
Party name: Attorneys Information Exchange Group
 
Mark Haddad Sidley Austin LLP(213) 896-6604
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA  90013
mhaddad@sidley.com
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
 
Allan Ides 919 Albany Street(323) 793-6845
Los Angeles, CA  90015
allan.ides@lls.edu
Party name: Professors of Civil Procedure and Federal Courts
 
Erik S. Jaffe Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.(202) 237-8165
5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20008
jaffe@esjpc.com
Party name: California Constitution Center
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Harrison, NY  10528
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Rachel Peter Kovner 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW (202) 514-8469
Washington, DC  20530
rachel.kovner@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
 
Thomas S. Leatherbury Vinson & Elkins LLP(214) 320-7700
Trammel Crow Center
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700
Dallas, TX  75201
tleatherbury@velaw.com
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and Texas Association of Broadcasters
 
Jonathan S. Massey Massey & Gail, LLP(202) 652-4511
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC  20005
jmassey@masseygail.com
Party name: MoneyMutual LLP
 
Jonathan S. Massey Massey & Gail, LLP(202) 652-4511
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC  20005
jmassey@masseygail.com
Party name: MoneyMutual LLP
 
Alan B. Morrison George Washington University Law School(202) 994-5157
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC  20052
abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
 
Robert S. Peck Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.(202) 944-2874
7916 Bressingham Drinve
Faifax Station, VA  22039
robert.peck@cclfirm.com
Party name: The American Association for Justice
 
Joel Gerard Pieper Womble Carlyle, Sandridge & Rice, LLP(404) 872-7000
271 17th Street, N.W., Suite 2400
Atlanta, GA  30363
jpieper@wcsr.com
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Brent M. Rosenthal Rosenthal Weiner LLP(214) 871-6600
12221 Merit Dr., Suite 1640
Dallas, TX  75251
brent@rosenthalweiner.com
Party name: Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization
 
Richard A. Samp Washington Legal Foundation(202) 588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
rsamp@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Alan E. Untereiner Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP(202) 775-4500
1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411L
Washington, DC  20006
auntereiner@robbinsrussell.com
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
May 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2