Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-460
No. 16-460
Title:
Stephanie C. Artis, Petitioner
v.
District of Columbia
Docketed:October 7, 2016
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
  Case Nos.:(15-CV-0243)
  Decision Date:April 7, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 6 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2016)
Oct 19 2016 Waiver of right of respondent District of Columbia to respond filed.
Nov 2 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 3 2016 Response Requested . (Due December 5, 2016)
Dec 1 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2017.
Jan 4 2017 Brief of respondent District of Columbia in opposition filed.
Jan 17 2017 Reply of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed.
Jan 18 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Petition GRANTED.
Mar 29 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 25, 2017.
Mar 29 2017 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Adam G. Unikowsky Jenner & Block, LLP(202) 639-6000
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001-4412
aunikowsky@jenner.com
Party name: Stephanie C. Artis
Attorneys for Respondent:
Todd S. Kim Solicitor General(202) 724-6609
    Counsel of Record D.C. Office of the Attorney General
441 Fourth Street, N.W., Suite 600-S
Washington, DC  20001
todd.kim@dc.gov
Party name: District of Columbia
April 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2