Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-408
No. 16-408
Title:
Kmart Corporation, Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. James Garbe
Docketed:September 30, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1502)
  Decision Date:May 27, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:July 18, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 23 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2016)
Oct 6 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States, ex rel. James Garbe to respond filed.
Oct 19 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2016.
Oct 20 2016 Response Requested . (Due November 21, 2016)
Nov 21 2016 Brief of respondent United States, ex rel. James Garbe in opposition filed.
Dec 6 2016 Reply of petitioner Kmart Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Dec 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
    Counsel of Record 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20006
jbucholtz@kslaw.com
Party name: Kmart Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents:
Robert L. King Korein Tillery LLC(314) 241-4844
    Counsel of Record One U.S. Bank Plaza
505 N. 7th Street, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO  63101
rking@koreintillery.com
Party name: United States, ex rel. James Garbe

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543