Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-367
No. 16-367
Title:
Robert C. Watson, Sr., Petitioner
v.
Beth Sims, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1763)
  Decision Date:April 29, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:June 22, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 20 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2016)
Sep 29 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 23, 2016, for all respondents.
Nov 17 2016 Brief of respondent Board of Education of the City of Poughkeepsie School District in opposition filed.
Nov 22 2016 Brief of respondent Jeffrey Baker in opposition filed.
Nov 23 2016 Brief of respondent Beth Sims in opposition filed.
Dec 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Dec 9 2016 Reply of petitioner Robert C. Watson, Sr. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 9 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen Bergstein Bergstein & Ulrich, LLP(845) 469-1277
    Counsel of Record15 Railroad Avenue
Chester, NY  10918
steve@tbulaw.com
Party name: Robert C. Watson, Sr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Stephen J. Gaba Drake Loeb PLLC(845) 458-7310
    Counsel of Record555 Hudson Valley Ave., Ste. 100
New Windsor, NY  12553
sgaba@drakeloeb.com
Party name: Jeffrey Baker
 
Nicole Marlow-Jones Costello Cooney Fearon PLLC(315) 422-1152
    Counsel of Record500 Plum St., Suite 300
Syracuse, NY  13204-1401
Party name: Beth Sims
 
Claudia A. Ryan Towne, Ryan & Partners, P.C.(518) 452-1800
    Counsel of Record450 New Karner Road
P.O. Box 15072
Albany, NY  12212
claudia.ryan@townelaw.com
Party name: Board of Education of the City of Poughkeepsie School District

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543