Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-364
No. 16-364
Vide 16-383
Title:
Joshua Blackman, Petitioner
v.
Amber Gascho, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:September 21, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-3798)
  Decision Date:May 13, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:June 20, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 19 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2016)
Oct 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute. filed.
Oct 19 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Global Fitness Holdings, LLC to respond filed.
Oct 19 2016 Brief amici curiae of The Attorneys General of Alabama, et al. filed.
Oct 19 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Robert Zik, James Heuaron and April Zik to respond filed.
Oct 21 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Lester Brickman filed.
Oct 21 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Amber Gascho, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 15 2016 Response Requested . (Due December 15, 2016)
Nov 29 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 17, 2017, for all respondents.
Jan 17 2017 Brief of respondent Global Fitness Holdings, LLC in opposition filed. VIDED.
Jan 17 2017 Brief of respondents Amber Gascho, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Jan 31 2017 Reply of petitioner Joshua Blackman filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Joshua Blackman Houston College of Law(202) 294-9003
1303 San Jacinto Street
Houston, TX  77002
jblackman@hcl.edu
Party name: Joshua Blackman
Attorneys for Respondents:
Pierre H. Bergeron Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP (202) 457-6000
    Counsel of Record 2550 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20037
pierre.bergeron@squirepb.com
Party name: Global Fitness Holdings, LLC
 
Joshua Taylor Rose Craig Henry PLC502 614-5962
    Counsel of Record 239 South Fifth Street
Suite 1400
Louisville, KY  40202
jrose@craighenrylaw.com
Party name: Robert Zik, James Heuaron and April Zik
 
Kenneth Joshua Rubin Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP(614) 464-6400
    Counsel of Record 52 East Gay Street
P.O. Box 1008
Columbus, OH  43215
kjrubin@vorys.com
Party name: Amber Gascho, et al.
Other:
Mark Brnovich Arizona Attorney General(602) 542-5025
1275 West Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ  85007-2926
Party name: The Attorneys General of Alabama, et al.
 
Matthew A. Fitzgerald McGuireWoods LLP(804) 775-4716
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA  23219
mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
Party name: Professor Lester Brickman
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute.
April 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2