Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-327
No. 16-327
Title:
Jae Lee, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 14, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5369)
  Decision Date:June 8, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 6 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2016)
Oct 11 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016.
Oct 14 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Oct 14 2016 Brief amici curiae of Asian Americans Advancing Justice l AAJC, and Other Immigrants' Rights Groups filed.
Oct 14 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Nov 9 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2016.
Nov 10 2016 Letter of November 3, 2016, from counsel for petitioner received waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Nov 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Nov 21 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Nov 23 2016 Reply of petitioner Jae Lee filed. (Distributed)
Dec 14 2016 Petition GRANTED.
Jan 26 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 1, 2017.
Jan 26 2017 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including March 6, 2017.
Jan 30 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Feb 1 2017 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Feb 1 2017 Brief of petitioner Jae Lee filed.
Feb 3 2017 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 28, 2017
Feb 6 2017 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Feb 6 2017 Brief amici curiae of Asian Americans Advancing Justice I AAJC, et al. filed.
Feb 7 2017 Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER. One restricted document also received.
Feb 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Feb 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Feb 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Feb 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Feb 8 2017 Brief amici curiae of Immigrant Defense Project, et al. filed.
Feb 22 2017 CIRCULATED.
Mar 6 2017 Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Mar 13 2017 Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 20 2017 Reply of petitioner Jae Lee filed. (Distributed)
Mar 28 2017 Argued. For petitioner: John J. Bursch, Caledonia, Mich. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 23 2017 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined except as to Part I. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John J. Bursch Bursch Law PLLC(616) 450-4235
    Counsel of Record9339 Cherry Valley Avenue SE, #78
Caledonia, MI  49316
jbursch@burschlaw.com
Party name: Jae Lee
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Eric J. Feigin Assistant to the Solicitor General(202)-305-2452
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC  20530
eric.feigin@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Chen-chen Cecelia Chang Asian Americans Advancing Justice AAJC 212-296-2300 x130
1620 L Street NW, Suite 1050
Washington, DC  120036
cchang@advancingjustice-aajc.org
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice l AAJC, and Other Immigrants' Rights Groups
 
Mark C. Fleming Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP(617) 526-6000
60 State Street
Boston, MA  02109
mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice I AAJC, et al.
 
Brianne Jenna Gorod Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
brianne@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
Jeffrey T. Green Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jgreen@sidley.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
Laura E. Howell Office of the Attorney General(334) 242-7300
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
lhowell@ago.state.al.us
Party name: Alabama, et al.
 
Linda A. Klein President(312) 988-5000
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL  60654
abapresident@americanbar.org
Party name: The American Bar Association
 
Ira J. Kurzban Kurzban, Kurzban, Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt PA(305) 444-0060
2650 S.W. 27th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Miami, FL  33133
ira@kkwtlaw.com
Party name: Immigrant Defense Project, et al.
 
Mitchell Aaron Mosvick 110 Townsend Avenue 612 618 8255
New Haven, CT  06512
mosvicklegal@gmail.com
Party name: The Cato Institute
 
Michael F. Smith The Smith Appellate Law Firm(202) 454-2860
1717 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC  20006
smith@smithpllc.com
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2