Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-307
No. 16-307
Title:
National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner
v.
Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2016
Linked with 16A112
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-60800)
  Decision Date:October 26, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 1 2016 Application (16A112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 11, 2016 to September 9, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 10 2016 Application (16A112) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 9, 2016.
Sep 9 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2016)
Sep 22 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 10, 2016.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed.
Nov 10 2016 Brief of respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Nov 30 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Nov 30 2016 Reply of petitioner National Labor Relations Board filed. (Distributed)
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017 The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the response briefs is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 11 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for respondents filed.
Apr 13 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for respondent in support Sheila M. Hobson.
Apr 28 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is further extended to and including June 9, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 28 2017 The time to file the response briefs is further extended to and including August 9, 2017. VIDED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
 
Edwin S. Kneedler Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
Attorneys for Respondents:
Harold C. Becker 815 16th St., NW(202) 637-5000
    Counsel of RecordWashington, DC  20006
cbecker@aflcio.org
Party name: Sheila M. Hobson in support of petitioner
 
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
 
Jeffrey A. Schwartz Jackson Lewis P.C.(404) 525-8200
1155 Peachtree St. NE, Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA  30309-3600
jschwartz@jacksonlewis.com
Party name: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Other:
Scott L. Nelson Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
snelson@citizen.org
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States
April 29, 2017 | Version 2014.2