Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-300
No. 16-300
Title:
Ernst & Young LLP, et al., Petitioners
v.
Stephen Morris, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-16599)
  Decision Date:August 22, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 8 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2016)
Sep 21 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Sep 29 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents
Oct 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 6 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016.
Oct 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Oct 10 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group filed.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Business Roundtable filed.
Oct 11 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Nov 15 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2016.
Nov 21 2016 Brief of respondents Stephen Morris, et al. in support of granting the petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Dec 6 2016 Reply of petitioners Ernst & Young LLP, et al. filed.
Dec 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-285 and 16-307 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017 The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 2 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs,in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the response briefs on the merits is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kannon K. Shanmugam Williams & Connolly LLP(202) 434-5000
    Counsel of Record725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
kshanmugam@wc.com
Party name: Ernst & Young LLP, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Max Folkenflik Folkenflik & McGerity, LLP(212) 757-0400
    Counsel of Record1500 Broadway, Suite 812
New York, NY  10036
mfolkenflik@fmlaw.net
Party name: Stephen Morris, et al.
 
Harold C. Becker 815 16th St., NW(202) 637-5000
Washington, DC  20006
www.aflcio.org
Party name: Sheila M. Hobson
Other:
Edward Fouad Berbarie Littler Mendelson, P.C.(214)-880-8100
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116
Dallas, TX  75201
eberbarie@littler.com
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
 
Beth Heifetz Jones Day(202) 879-3939
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC  20001
bheifetz@jonesday.com
Party name: The Employers Group
 
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4190
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinlaw.com
Party name: Business Roundtable
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Harrison, NY  10528
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
 
Benjamin G. Robbins New England Legal Foundation(617) 695-3660
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA  02111-2504
benrobbins@nelfonline.org
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
 
Mary-Christine Sungaila Haynes and Boone, LLP(949) 202-3062
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA  92626
mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
Party name: International Association of Defense Counsel
 
Adam G. Unikowsky Jenner & Block, LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001-4412
aunikowsky@jenner.com
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
March 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2