Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-30
No. 16-30
Title:
Jefferson Morley, Petitioner
v.
Central Intelligence Agency
Docketed:July 6, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5230)
  Decision Date:January 21, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 5 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2016)
Jul 27 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Central Intelligence Agency to respond filed.
Aug 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
James H. Lesar 930 Wayne Avenue, Unit 1111(301) 328-5920
    Counsel of RecordSilver Spring, MD  20910
Party name: Jefferson Morley
Attorneys for Respondent:
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Central Intelligence Agency

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543