Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-299
No. 16-299
Title:
National Association of Manufacturers, Petitioner
v.
Department of Defense, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2016
Linked with 16A11
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3751)
  Decision Date:February 22, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:April 21, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 30 2016 Application (16A11) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 20, 2016 to September 2, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 1 2016 Application (16A11) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 2, 2016.
Sep 2 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2016)
Sep 29 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2016.
Oct 5 2016 Brief of respondents Agrowstar LLC, et al. in support filed.
Oct 7 2016 Brief of respondents American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. in support filed.
Oct 7 2016 Brief of respondents Ohio, et al. filed.
Oct 28 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 7, 2016.
Dec 7 2016 Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Dec 20 2016 Reply of petitioner National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Dec 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Petition GRANTED.
Jan 27 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for the petitioner filed.
Jan 31 2017 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner National Association of Manufacturers.
Feb 1 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents AGrowStar, LLC, et al.
Feb 15 2017 The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including March 29, 2017.
Feb 17 2017 The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including May 31, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Mar 6 2017 Motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed by federal respondents.
Mar 7 2017 The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including April 13, 2017.
Mar 15 2017 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 15 2017 Opposition of respondents American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. to motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed. (Distributed)
Mar 15 2017 Response of respondents Ohio, et al. to motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed. (Distributed)
Mar 15 2017 Opposition of respondents Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. to motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed. (Distributed)
Mar 16 2017 Opposition of respondents Waterkeeper Alliance, et al. to motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed. (Distributed)
Mar 17 2017 Opposition of respondents New York, et al. to motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed. (Distributed)
Apr 3 2017 Motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance DENIED.
Apr 6 2017 The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including April 27, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Timothy S. Bishop Mayer Brown LLP(312) 782-0600
    Counsel of Record71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL  60606
tbishop@mayerbrown.com
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers
Attorneys for Respondents:
Andrew D. Bing Deputy Solicitor General(518) 776-2050
    Counsel of Record The Capitol
Albany, NY  12224-0341
Andrew.Bing@ag.ny.gov
Party name: New York, et al.
 
Eric F. Citron Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
    Counsel of Record7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council (NRDC)
 
M. Reed Hopper Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
    Counsel of Record930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
mrh@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Agrowstar LLC, et al.
 
Eric E. Murphy State Solicitor(614) 466-8980
    Counsel of Record Office of the Ohio Attorney's General
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl.
Columbus, OH  43215-3428
eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Ohio, et al.
 
Ellen Steen American Farm Bureau Federation(202) 406-3616
    Counsel of Record600 Maryland Ave., SW, Suite 1000W
Washington, DC  20024
ellens@fb.org
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation, et al.
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of Defense, et al.
April 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2