Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-285
No. 16-285
Title:
Epic Systems Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Jacob Lewis
Docketed:September 2, 2016
Linked with 16A93
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2997)
  Decision Date:May 26, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 25 2016 Application (16A93) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2016 to September 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 29 2016 Application (16A93) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 23, 2016.
Sep 2 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016)
Sep 7 2016 Consent to filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Sep 20 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
Sep 29 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016.
Sep 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Sep 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Nov 14 2016 Brief of respondent Jacob Lewis in opposition filed.
Nov 29 2016 Reply of petitioner Epic Systems Corporation filed.
Nov 30 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017 Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-300 and 16-307 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017 The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 20 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondent.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017 The time to file the response briefs is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 11 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Epic Systems Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent:
David C. Zoeller Hawks Quindel ,S.C.(608) 257-0040
    Counsel of Record222 W. Washington Ave., Suite 450
Madison, WI  53701-2155
dzoeller@hq-law.com
Party name: Jacob Lewis
 
Harold C. Becker 815 16th St., NW(202) 637-5000
Washington, DC  20006
cbecker@aflcio.org
Party name: Sheila M. Hobson
 
Max Folkenflik Folkenflik & McGerity, LLP(212) 757-0400
1500 Broadway, Suite 812
New York, NY  10036
mfolkenflik@fmlaw.net
Party name: Stephen Morris and Kelly McDaniel
 
Daniel R. Ortiz 580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA  22903
Party name: Jacob Lewis
 
Jeffrey A. Schwartz Jackson Lewis P.C.(404) 525-8200
1155 Peachtree St. NE, Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA  30309-3600
jschwartz@jacksonlewis.com
Party name: Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
 
Kannon K. Shanmugam Williams & Connolly LLP(202) 434-5000
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
kshanmugam@wc.com
Party name: Ernst & Young LLP and Ernst & Young U.S. LLP
Other:
Edward Fouad Berbarie Littler Mendelson, P.C.(214)-880-8100
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116
Dallas, TX  75201-2931
eberbarie@littler.com
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Harrison, NY  10528
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
 
Deborah J. La Fetra Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
 
Benjamin G. Robbins New England Legal Foundation(617) 695-3660
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA  02111-2504
benrobbins@nelfonline.org
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
 
Mary-Christine Sungaila Haynes and Boone, LLP(949) 202-3062
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA  92626
mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
Party name: International Association of Defense Counsel
 
Rae T. Vann NT Lakis, LLP(202) 629-5600
1501 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20005
rvann@ntlakis.com
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council
 
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
April 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2