Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-283
No. 16-283
Vide 16-413
Title:
Scott Gilchrist, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Carlton Chester "Cookie" Gilchrist, Petitioner
v.
National Football League, et al.
Docketed:September 2, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2290)
  Decision Date:April 18, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 30 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016)
Sep 13 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Curtis Anderson, Objector - Appellant to respond filed.
Sep 14 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2016, for all respondents.
Sep 26 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Jimmie H. Jones, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 29 2016 Brief of Miller respondents in support filed.
Oct 27 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2016, for all respondents.
Nov 2 2016 Waiver of right of respondents National Football League, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 4 2016 Brief of respondents Kevin Turner, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 4 2016 Brief of respondents The National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC in opposition filed. VIDED.
Nov 16 2016 Reply of petitioner Scott Gilchrist, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Carlton Chester "Cookie" Gilchrist filed.
Nov 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Nov 22 2016 Supplemental brief of respondents Kevin Turner, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Dec 12 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Cullin A. O'Brien 6541 NE 21st Way(561) 676-6370
    Counsel of RecordFt. Lauderdale, FL  33308
cullin@cullinobrienlaw.com
Party name: Scott Gilchrist, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Carlton Chester "Cookie" Gilchrist
Attorneys for Respondents:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: The National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC
 
George W. Cochran Law Office of George Cochran(330) 607-2187
    Counsel of Record 1385 Russell Drive
Streetsboro, OH  44241
Party name: Curtis Anderson, Objector - Appellant
 
Samuel Issacharoff 40 Washington Square South(212) 998-6580
    Counsel of RecordSuite 411J
New York, NY  10012
si13@nyu.edu
Party name: Kevin Turner, et al.
 
Gene Locks Locks Law Firm(215) 893-3434
    Counsel of Record 601 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA  19106
Party name: National Football League, et al.
 
John J. Pentz Law Office of John J. Pentz(978) 261-5725
    Counsel of Record 19 Widow Rites Lane
Sudbury, MA  01776
jjpemtz3@gmail.com
Party name: Miller respondents
 
Cyril V. Smith Zuckerman Spaeder LLP(410) 949-1145
    Counsel of Record 100 East Pratt Street, Suite 2440
Baltimore, MD  21202-1031
csmith@zuckerman.com
Party name: Jimmie H. Jones, et al.
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2