Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-273
No. 16-273
Title:
Gloucester County School Board, Petitioner
v.
G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm
Docketed:September 1, 2016
Linked with 16A52
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2056, 16-1733)
  Decision Date:April 19, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2016
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 13 2016 Application (16A52) to recall and stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 14 2016 Response to application (16A52) requested by The Chief Justice, due Wednesday, July 27, 2016, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jul 26 2016 Response to application from respondent G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm filed.
Jul 29 2016 Reply of applicant Gloucester County School Board filed.
Aug 3 2016 Application (16A52) referred to the Court.
Aug 3 2016 The application to recall and stay the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit in case No. 15-2056, presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted and the preliminary injunction entered by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia on June 23, 2016, is hereby stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. Justice Breyer, concurring (Detached Opinion) Justice Ginsburg, Justice Sotomayor, and Jusitce Kagan would deny the application.
Aug 15 2016 Application (16A166) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2016 to September 28, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 15 2016 Response to application from respondent G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm filed.
Aug 16 2016 Application (16A166) denied by The Chief Justice.
Aug 29 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016)
Sep 6 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support, of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Sep 13 2016 Brief of respondent G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm in opposition filed.
Sep 22 2016 Brief amici curiae of Liberty, Life, and Law Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 22 2016 Brief amici curiae of Gail Heriot and Peter N. Kirsanow, members of the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights, in their capacities as private citizens filed.
Sep 23 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Sep 26 2016 Reply of petitioner Gloucester County School Board filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of Professional Educators From 46 States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amicus curiae of William J. Bennett filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Women's Liberation Front filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of Cardinal Newman Society, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amici curiae of West Virginia and 18 other States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 27 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty filed. (Distributed)
Sep 28 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2016.
Sep 28 2016 Brief amici curiae of 8,914 Students, Parents, Grandparents and Community Members, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 30 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Marriage and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. (Distributed)
Sep 30 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Missouri filed. (Distributed)
Oct 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 28 2016 Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 2 and 3 presented by the petition.
Nov 22 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for petitioner.
Dec 7 2016 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 3, 2017.
Dec 7 2016 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 23, 2017.
Jan 3 2017 Joint appendix filed.
Jan 3 2017 Brief of petitioner Gloucester County School Board filed.
Jan 6 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Safe Spaces for Women in support of neither party filed.
Jan 9 2017 Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Public Safety Experts filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Professors Dean Ronald A. Cass, Christopher C. Demuth, Sr., and Christopher J. Walker filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of General Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventists, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Dr. Paul R. McHugh, M.D., Dr. Paul Hruz,M.D., Ph.D., and Dr. Lawrence S. Mayer, Ph.D. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of West Virginia and 20 Other States, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Major Religious Organizations filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Women's Liberation Front, and Family Policy Alliance filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Dr. Judith Reisman and the Child Protection Institute filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of William J. Bennett filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Gail Heriot and Peter N. Kirsanow, members of the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights, in their capacities as private citizens filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Marriage and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Religious Colleges, Schools and Educators filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of The National School Boards Association, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amici curiae of Christian Educators Association International, et al. filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Jan 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support of neither party filed.
Jan 18 2017 Proposal of respondent to lodge copies of a redacted Gloucester County Circuit Court order of 9/9/16, and the subsequent amended birth certificate issued to Mr. Grimm on 10/27/16.
Jan 19 2017 Letter of petitioner in opposition to respondent's proposed lodging.
Jan 19 2017 Letter of respondent in response to petitioner's lodging opposition.
Jan 24 2017 Motion of West Virginia, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Jan 31 2017 Opposition of respondent to motion of West Virginia, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument.
Feb 3 2017 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 28, 2017
Feb 6 2017 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Feb 6 2017 Reply of West Virginia, et al. in support of motion for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument.
Feb 7 2017 Record received from U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Feb 22 2017 CIRCULATED.
Feb 22 2017 Advisory letter from the Solicitor General with attachment (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Rights Division letter dated February 22, 2017) received and distributed.
Feb 23 2017 Request from the Clerk that the parties submit their views on how this case should proceed in light of the guidance document issued by the Department of Education and Department of Justice on February 22, 2017. The parties' views should be in the form of letters delivered to the Court and served upon counsel by 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 1, 2017.
Feb 23 2017 Brief of respondent G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm filed. (Distributed)
Feb 28 2017 Brief amici curiae of National PTA, GLSEN, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 1 2017 Letter of petitioner per 2/23/17 request of Clerk filed and distributed.
Mar 1 2017 Letter of respondent per 2/23/17 request of Clerk filed and distributed.
Mar 1 2017 Brief amici curiae of Apple, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 1 2017 Brief amici curiae of Reagan Greenberg, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of World Professional Association for Transgender Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Watch, and The New York City Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Officers filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Transgender Students and Allies filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of the Equality Federation filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-Based Violence Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Montgomery County Public Schools filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel Bagenstos, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Scholars Who Study the Transgender Population filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Terry S. Kogan filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Impact Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Dr. Ben Barres, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of PFLAG, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Mills College filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., and the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Presiding Bishop of the Episcopal Church and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of interACT: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Martine Rothblatt filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of School Administrators from Thirty-One States and the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of 196 Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State and the National LGBT Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of Secretary of Education Arne Duncan, Secretary of Education John B. King, Jr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of City and County of San Francisco, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 2 2017 Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 6 2017 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit for further consideration in light of the guidance document issued by the Department of Education and Department of Justice on February 22, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
S. Kyle Duncan Schaerr | Duncan LLP(202) 714-9492; (202) 787-1060
    Counsel of Record1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20006
kduncan@schaerr-duncan.com
Party name: Gloucester County School Board
Attorneys for Respondent:
Joshua A. Block ACLU(212)-549-2593
    Counsel of Record125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004
jblock@aclu.org
Party name: G. G., By His Next Friend and Mother, Deirdre Grimm
Other:
Ryan Lee Bangert Baker Botts LLP214-953-6915
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 600
Dallas, TX  75201
ryan.bangert@bakerbotts.com
Party name: Safe Spaces for Women
 
Peter T. Barbur Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP(212) 474-1000
Worldwide Plaza
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY  10019-7475
pbarbur@cravath.com
Party name: 196 Members of Congress
 
Eric S. Baxter The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty(202) 955-0095
1200 New Hampshire Ave. NW, Ste. 700
Washington, DC  20036
ebaxter@becketfund.org
Party name: General Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventists, et al.
 
Richard D. Bernstein Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP(202) 303-1108
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
rbernstein@willkie.com
Party name: National PTA, GLSEN, et al.
 
Jeffrey L. Bleich Dentons US LLP(415) 882-5020
One Market Plaza
Spear Tower, Twenty-Fourth Floor
San Francisco, CA  94105
jeffrey.bleich@dentons.com
Party name: Secretary of Education Arne Duncan, Secretary of Education John B. King, Jr., et al.
 
David Gabriel Bookbinder Office of David Bookbinder, PLLC(301) 751-0611
107 S. West Street, Suite 491
Alexandria, VA  22134
david.bookbinder@verizon.net
Party name: Women's Liberation Front
 
David C. Boyle P.O. Box 15143 (734)-904-6132
Long Beach, CA  90815
dbo@boyleslaw.org
Party name: David Boyle in support of neither party
 
Gerard V. Bradley 3156 Eck Hall of Law(574)-631-8385
Notre Dame, IN  46556
gerard.v.bradley.16@nd.edu
Party name: Dr. Paul R. McHugh, M.D., Dr. Paul Hruz,M.D., Ph.D., and Dr. Lawrence S. Mayer, Ph.D.,
 
Ronald A. Cass Cass & Associates, PC(703) 438-7590
10560 Fox Forest Drive
Great Falls, VA  22066-1743
roncass@cassassociates.net
Party name: Professors - Dear Ronald A. Cass, Christopher C. Demuth, Sr., and Christopher J. Walker
 
Kenneth Y. Choe Hogan Lovells, US LLP(202) 637-5675
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
ken.choe@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State and The National LGBT Bar Association
 
Eric F. Citron Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
Party name: Professors Samuel Bagenstos, et al.
 
William S. Consovoy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(703) 243-9423
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
will@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Members of Congress
 
Charles J. Cooper Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Party name: William J. Bennett
 
Jaime H. Delaye City Attorney's Office(415) 554-3957
City Hall Room 234
One Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl.
San Francisco, CA  94102
jaime.hulingdelaye@sfgov.org
Party name: City and County of San Francisco, et al.
 
Walter Dellinger O'Melveny & Myers LLP(202) 383-5319
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
wdellinger@omm.com
Party name: Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-Based Violence Organizations
 
Deborah Dewart 620 E. Sabiston Drive (910)-326-4554
Swansboro, NC  28584-9674
debcpalaw@earthlink.net
Party name: Liberty, Life, and Law Foundation, et al. North Carolina Value Coalition, et al.
 
John C. Dwyer Cooley LLP(650) 843-5000
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA  94304
dwyerjc@cooley.com
Party name: PFLAG, Inc., et al.
 
John C. Eastman Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2587
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92866
jeastman@chapman.edu
Party name: National Organization for Marriage and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Steven W. Fitschen The National Legal Foundation(757)-463-6133
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA  23454
nlf@nlf.net
Party name: Concerned Women for America
 
Barry J. Fleishman Shapiro, Lifschitz & Schram, P.C.(202) 689-1900
1742 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
fleishman@slslaw.com
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
 
Katherine Melanie Forster Munger Tolles & Olson LLP213.683.9538
350 South Grand Avenue
Fiftieth Floor
Los Angeles, CA  90071-1560
Katherine.Forster@mto.com
Party name: Law Enforcement Officers
 
Michael Lee Francisco MRDLAW(303) 325-7843
3301West Clyde Place
Denver, CO  80211
michael.francisco@mrd.law
Party name: Public Safety Experts
 
Michael Lee Francisco MRDLaw(303) 325-7843
3301 West Clyde PLace
Denver, CO  80211
michael.francisco@mrd.law
Party name: Professional Educators From 46 States
 
Aderson Bellegarde Francois Institute for Public Representation(202) 661-6721
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20001
anderson.francois@law.georgetown.edu
Party name: Reagan Greenberg, et al.
 
Anthony Lee Francois Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
alf@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Suzanne B. Goldberg Columbia Law School(212) 854-0411
Sexuality and Gender Law Center
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY  10027
sgoldb1@law.columbia.edu
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., and the Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund
 
Brianne Jenna Gorod Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
brianne@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
Richard Shawn Gunnarson Kiront McConckie(801) 328-3600
1800 World Trade Center
60 East South Temple Street
Salt Lake City, UT  84111
sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
Party name: Major Religious Organizations
 
Mark Haddad Sidley Austin LLP(213) 896-66604
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA  90013
mhaddad@sidley.com
Party name: Scholars Who Study the Transgender Population
 
Douglas Hallward-Driemeier Ropes & Gray LLP(202) 508-4776
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006-6807
Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
Party name: Equality Federation
 
Thomas M. Hefferon Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
901 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20001
thefferon@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: World Professional Association for Transgender Health, et al.
 
Gail L. Heriot 175 East Delaware Place, Suite 9009 (619) 260-2331
Chicago, IL  60611
gheriot@me.com
Party name: Gail Heriot and Peter N. Kirsanow, members of the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights, in their capacities as private citizens
 
Derek T. Ho Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.(202)-326-7931
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036-3209
dho@khhte.com
Party name: Montgomery County Public Schools
 
Phillip L. Jauregui Judicial Action Group(202) 216-9309
1015 15th At., NW
Washington, DC  20005
plj@judicialactiongroup.com
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
 
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
lj@larryjoseph.com
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
 
Linda A. Klein President(312) 988-5000
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL  60654
abapresident@americanbar.org
Party name: American Bar Association
 
Jonah Moses Knobler Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP212336-2000
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
jknobler@pbwt.com
Party name: interACT: Advocates for Intersex Youth, et al.
 
Andrew McHie Lacy Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP(202) 636-5500
900 G Street, NW
Washington, DC  20001
alacy@stblaw.com
Party name: Professor Terry S. Kogan
 
James R. Layton Solicitor General(573) 751-1800
Office of the Attorney General
P. O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO  65102
james.layton@ago.mo.gov
Party name: Missouri
 
Richard L. Levine Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP(212) 310-8286
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY  10153
richard.levine@weil.com
Party name: Human Rights Watch, and The New York City Bar Association
 
Elbert Lin Solicitor General(304) 558-2021
Office of Attorney General
State Capitol
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV  25305
Elbert.Lin@wvago.gov
Party name: West Virginia and 18 other States, et al. West Virginia and 20 Other States, et al.
 
Jesse Ryan Loffler Fried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson LLP212-859-8216
One New York Plaza
New York, NY  10004
jesse.loffler@friedfrank.com
Party name: Transgender Students and Allies
 
Mario Loyola Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty(414) 727-9455
1139 East Knapp Street
Milwaukee, WI  53202
mario@will-law.org
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
 
Deanne E. Maynard Morrison & Foerster LLP(202) 887-8740
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
DMaynard@mofo.com
Party name: Mills College
 
Gary Stuart McCaleb Alliance Defending Freedom(480)-444-0020
15100 North 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ  85260
gmccaleb@ADFlegal.org
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
 
Karla McKanders Howard University of School of Law(202) 806-8065
Civil Rights Clinic
2900 Vann Ness Street, NW
Washington, DC  20008
Karlamckanders@howard.edu
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
 
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mpunt Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI  48917
greatlakesJC.org
Party name: Christian Educators Association International, et al.
 
Lindsay Polastri Nako Impact Fund5108453473
125 University Ave.
Suite 102
Berkeley, CA  94710
lnako@impactfund.org
Party name: Impact Fund, et al.
 
Alice M. O'Brien National Education Association(202) 822-7035
1201 16th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
aobrien@nea.org
Party name: National Education Association, et al.
 
Robert Jeffrey Olson William J. Olson PC703-356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
 
Deborah H. Renner Baker & Hostetler, LLP(212) 589-4200
45 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY  10111
drenner@bakerlaw.com
Party name: Apple, et al.
 
Dean Richlin Foley Hoag LLP(617) 832-1000
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA  02210
drichlin@foleyhoag.com
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al.
 
Charles A. Rothfeld Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3000
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
Party name: National Women's Law Center, et al.
 
Richard Mark Segal Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP(619) 234-5000
1200 Seventeenth Street, NW, Suite 1100
San Diego, CA  92101
richard.segal@pillsburylaw.com
Party name: School Administrators from Thirty-One States and the District of Columbia
 
Kelly J. Shackelford Liberty Institute(972) 941-4444
2001 W. Plano Parkway, Suite 1600
Plano, TX  75075
kshackford@libertyinstitute.org
Party name: Cardinal Newman Society, et al. Religious Colleges, Schools and Educators
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
 
Mathew D. Staver Liberty Counsel(800) 671-1776
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL  327854
court@lc.org
Party name: Dr. Judith Reisman and the Child Protection Institute
 
Michelle Shamblin Stratton 700 Louisiana Street713-221-2354
Suite 2300
Houston, TX  77002
mstratton@skv.com
Party name: The National School Boards Association, et al.
 
Jeffrey S. Trachtman Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP(212) 715-9100
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
Party name: Presiding Bishop of the Episcopal Church and President of the House of Deputies of the Episcopal Church, et al.
 
Barbara D. Underwood Solicitor General(212) 416-8020
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY  10271
barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
Party name: States of New York, et al.
 
Kristen K. Waggoner Alliance Defending Freedom(480) 444-0020
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ  85260
kwaggoner@ADFlegal.org
Party name: 8,914 Students, Parents, Grandparents and Community Members, et al.
 
Scott Block Wilkens Jenner & Block, LLP(202) 639-6000
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW, Suite 1099
Washington, DC  20005
swilkens@jenner.com
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics, et al.
 
Tobias Barrington Wolff University of Pennsylvania Law School(215) 898-7471
3501 Sansom Street
Philadelphia, PA  19104
twolff@law.upenn.edu
Party name: Martine Rothblatt
 
Howard S. Zelbo Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP(212) 225-2000
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY  10006-1470
Party name: Dr. Ben Barres, et al.
March 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2