Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-239
No. 16-239
Title:
Bettina M. Whyte, as Trustee of the SemGroup Litigation Trust, Petitioner
v.
Barclays Bank PLC, et al.
Docketed:August 24, 2016
Linked with 15A1255
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-2653)
  Decision Date:March 24, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 10 2016 Application (15A1255) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2016 to July 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jun 10 2016 Application (15A1255) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 22, 2016.
Jul 12 2016 Application (15A1255) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 22, 2016 to August 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jul 12 2016 Application (15A1255) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 19, 2016.
Aug 19 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2016)
Sep 15 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 24, 2016.
Oct 24 2016 Brief of respondents Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital in opposition filed.
Nov 4 2016 Reply of petitioner Bettina M. Whyte, as Trustee of the SemGroup Litigation Trust filed.
Nov 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 16 2016 Rescheduled.
Nov 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Dec 1 2016 Rescheduled.
Feb 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 22 2017 Rescheduled.
Feb 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 27 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 13 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 13 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 20 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Rescheduled.
Mar 27 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 28 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 1 2017 Rescheduled.
May 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Susheel Kirpalani Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(212) 849-7000
    Counsel of Record51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10010
susheelkirpalani@quinnemanuel.com
Party name: Bettina M. Whyte, as Trustee of the SemGroup Litigation Trust
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey Thomas Scott Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP(212)-558-4000
    Counsel of Record125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004
scottj@sullcrom.com
Party name: Barclays Bank PLC, et al.
 
July 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2