Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-229
No. 16-229
Title:
COPE, aka Citizens for Objective Public Education, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kansas State Board of Education, et al.
Docketed:August 22, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-3280)
  Decision Date:April 19, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:May 20, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 16 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2016)
Aug 24 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Kansas State Board of Education, et al. to respond filed.
Sep 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 12 2016 Response Requested . (Due October 12, 2016)
Oct 11 2016 Brief of respondents Kansas State Board of Education, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 24 2016 Reply of petitioners COPE, aka Citizens for Objective Public Education, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 25 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016.
Nov 14 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kevin T. Snider Pacific Justice Institute(916) 857-6900
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 276600
Sacramento, CA  95827
ksnider@pji.org
Party name: COPE, aka Citizens for Objective Public Education, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Stephen R. McAllister Solicitor General(785) 296-2215
    Counsel of Record Office of Attorney General
120 S.W. 10th Ave., 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS  66612
steve.mcallister@trqlaw.com
Party name: Kansas State Board of Education, et al.
 
Dwight R. Carswell Kansas Attorney General's Office(785) 296-2215
120 SW 10th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS  66612-1597
dwight.carswell@ag.ks.gov
Party name: Kansas State Board of Education, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543