Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-20
No. 16-20
Title:
David Billings, et al., Petitioners
v.
Propel Financial Services, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 1, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-51326, 15-50199, 15-50340, 15-50437)
  Decision Date:April 29, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:May 27, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 29 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2016)
Jul 11 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Propel Financial Services, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Jul 29 2016 Response Requested . (Due August 29, 2016)
Aug 11 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 28, 2016.
Sep 28 2016 Brief of respondents Propel Financial Services, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 5 2016 Reply of petitioners David Billings, et al. filed.
Oct 12 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 31 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Jon Dale Lowe 300 Convent, 25th Floor 210-220-1348
    Counsel of RecordSan Antonio, TX  78205
jlowe@mdtlaw.com
Party name: David Billings, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Pratik A. Shah Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP(202) 887-4000
    Counsel of Record 1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20036
pshah@akingump.com
Party name: Propel Financial Services, LLC, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543