Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1436
No. 16-1436
Title:
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1190
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(17-1351)
  Decision Date:May 31, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 1 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Jun 1 2017 Application (16A1190) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 2 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jun 2 2017 The respondents are directed to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 2 2017 Application (16A1190) referred to the Court.
Jun 2 2017 Response to application due on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Jun 5 2017 Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of Texas, et al. in support of petitioners.
Jun 9 2017 Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Jun 9 2017 Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amicus brief filed by T.A. in support of respondents.
Jun 9 2017 Brief amicus curiae of T.A. in support of respondent filed.
Jun 9 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents.
Jun 9 2017 Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 9 2017 Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents filed.
Jun 9 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Susan Abeles in support of neither party filed.
Jun 9 2017 Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners filed.
Jun 9 2017 Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 10 2017 Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support neither party filed.
Jun 12 2017 Brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 12 2017 Response to application from respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of New York, et al. in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of Virginia, et al.in opposition to the stay applications.
Jun 12 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former National Security Officials in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional law scholars in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed Former National Security Officials in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Jun 14 2017 Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017 Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 20 2017 Supplemental brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Omar C. Jadwat American Civil Liberties Union Foundation(212) 549-2620
    Counsel of Record125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY  10004
ojadwat@aclu.org
Party name: International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Other:
Richard D. Bernstein Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP(202) 303-1100
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
rbernstein@willkie.com
Party name: T.A. in support of respondent
 
David C. Boyle P.O. Box 15143 (734)-904-6132
Long Beach, CA  90815
dbo@boyleslaw.org
Party name: David Boyle
 
William S. Consovoy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(703) 243-9423
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
will@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
 
Christopher J. Hajec 25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335 202-232-5590
Washington, DC  20001
chaiec@irli.org
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
 
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
lj@larryjoseph.com
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc.
 
Roberta A. Kaplan Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP(212) 373-3000
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10019-6064
rkaplan@paulweiss.com
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
 
Scott A. Keller Solicitor General(512) 936-1700
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2548
scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
 
Harold Hongju Koh Rule of Law Clinic(203) 432-4932
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street, P.O. Box 208215
New Haven, CT  06520-8215
harold.koh@yale.edu
Party name: Former National Security Officials
 
Nathan Lewin Lewin & Lewin, LLP(202) 828-1000
888 17th Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC  20006
nat@lewinlewin.com
Party name: Susan Abeles
 
Mark L. Rienzi The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty(202) 955-0095
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC  20036
mrienzi@becketfund.org
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
 
Joshua David Rogaczewski McDermott Will & Emery, LLP202-756-8195
The McDermott Building, 500 North Capitol Street, Northwest
Washington, DC  20001
jrogaczewski@mwe.com
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents
 
Jay Alan Sekulow American Center for Law & Justice(202) 546-8890
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC  20002
sekulow@aclj.org
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
 
Herbert W. Titus William J. Olson, PC(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180 - 5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
 
Barbara D. Underwood New York Office of the Attorney General(212) 416-8020
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY  10271-0332
barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
Party name: The States of New York, et al.
 
Barnaby W. Zall 685 Spring St. #314 360-378-6600
Friday Harbor, WA  98250
bzall@aol.com or bzall@bzall.com
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute, et al.
June 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2