Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1356
No. 16-1356
Title:
Anthony Piszel, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 9, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-5100)
  Decision Date:August 18, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 9 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2017)
Jun 2 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 10, 2017.
Jun 8 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
William Edward Donnelly 555 13th Street, NW, Suite 410W 202-661-7011
    Counsel of RecordWashington, DC  20004
wdonnelly@mmlawus.com
Party name: Anthony Piszel
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
David G. Cabrales Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP(214) 999-3000
2021 McKinney Avenue, Ste. 1600
Dallas, TX  75201
dcabrales@gardere.com
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
June 14, 2017 | Version 2014.2