Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1333
No. 16-1333
Title:
Howard E. Nease, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Ford Motor Company
Docketed:May 5, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1950)
  Decision Date:February 1, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 2 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 15 2017 Waiver of right of respondent Ford Motor Company to respond filed.
May 23 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kenneth Chesebro 1600 Massachusetts Ave.(617) 661-4423
    Counsel of RecordNo. 801
Cambridge, MA  02138
kenchesebro@msn.com
Party name: Howard E. Nease, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jonathan D. Hacker O'Melveny & Myers LLP(202) 383-5300
    Counsel of Record1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
jhacker@omm.com
Party name: Ford Motor Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543