Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1323
No. 16-1323
Vide 16-1450
Title:
Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2017
Linked with 16A789
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-2037, 14-2049)
  Decision Date:June 7, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 2 2017 Application (16A789) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 2, 2017 to April 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Feb 13 2017 Application (16A789) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 3, 2017.
Mar 14 2017 Application (16A789) to extend further the time from April 3, 2017 to May 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Mar 17 2017 Application (16A789) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 1, 2017.
May 1 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 11 2017 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jun 1 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Association of Corporate Counsel filed.
Jun 5 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jun 5 2017 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Jun 5 2017 Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Paul R.Q. Wolfson Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Lawrence S. Ebner Capital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC(202) 729-6337
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC  20006
lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
Party name: Association of Corporate Counsel
 
Jeffrey T. Green Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8000
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jgreen@sidley.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
Linda A. Klein President(312) 988-5000
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL  60654
abapresident@americanbar.org
Party name: The American Bar Association
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2